+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
February 10, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor