+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 131
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-12 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
February 8, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor