+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 14, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 8, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
February 7, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
February 7, 2023: House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor