+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by GE - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 8, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 4, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor