+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Rodriguez - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 5, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
March 2, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
February 4, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor