+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate first read
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Crandall
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 27, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 5
February 14, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2