+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 258
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:10 pmobject
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Judd
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farley
- Amendment: see motion
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Farley to incl flr am to bill failed by s/v 14-27
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Gould flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gould flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-9 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
4-5 jud_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 7, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2