+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: withdrawn.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12