+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Payne - passed
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Kavanagh - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Rodriguez - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (6)
May 17, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 9
May 13, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
March 4, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 26
February 3, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8