+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Pratt flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: do pass and proper for consideration.
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Transmit to Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
March 19, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 5, 2020: Senate Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 4, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
February 6, 2020: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 6, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor