+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2772 substituted for SB 1797. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to COM - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 12, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
February 3, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor