+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by TRANS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 21
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor