+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules
- Approp
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Nichols
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - Prezelski - failed s/v 25-32
- COW motion
- Rep. Prezelski moved to amend the Committee of the Whole report to include the Prezelski floor. Motion failed by RCV.: TRANSMIT TO SENATE: 03/09/07
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Nichols Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Nichols Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-14 gov-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 7
February 7, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 7, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor