+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor