+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (7)
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 14, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 8, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 10
February 7, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 15
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 7, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1