+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 237
- Action: Signed
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref Bill) (sub APPROP)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendments (12)
C Gray Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill, substitute to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
C Gray Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill, substitute to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-4 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
5-22 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 24, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
May 21, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 8, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3