+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2758 substituted for SB 1545. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Second read in House.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
May 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
May 21, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
May 21, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor