+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Gray motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass HB 2757 on Third Reading on March 29, 2021. Motion carried.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Payne - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Representative Payne motion to reconsider House Bill 2757 within 14 days. Motion passed v/v
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 15
March 8, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor