+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2757 substituted for SB 1546. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cano - failed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Second read in House.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
May 24, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
May 21, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
May 21, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor