+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 168
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HHS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Yee
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Yee Floor Amendment; Reference to the HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-13 hmlr
Senate Fact Sheet
Yee Floor Amendment; Reference to the HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 7, 2012: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2012: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor