+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 2, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 278
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmit to Senate
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On June 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Gould, Gray L, Mccune Davis
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Pearce, Ableser, Biggs
On June 12, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
On June 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Motion
- Vote detail 21 5 4 0 y passed
On May 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senator gould motion to reconsider whereby failed to pass hb 2753 on third reading on april 25, 2007. motion carried by division of 13-7.
- Senator gould motion to suspend Senate rule 13-a for the purpose of reconsidering hb 2753 which failed on april 25, 2007. motion carried.
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senator gould motion to reconsider whereby failed to pass hb 2753 on third reading on april 25, 2007. motion failed.
- Third read: Failed
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Blendu flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref TRANS)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Pearce
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:00 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (21)
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Blendu Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-20 trans corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
June 20, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
June 11, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2007: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 7, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor