+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by ED - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 13, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 13, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 9, 2023: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8