+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 10, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to COM - Hernandez A - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 10
April 20, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
March 23, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
March 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
February 2, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8