+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Homeland Security and Property Rights
House Adopted Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor