+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 131
- Action: Signed
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment, reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendment, reference to JUD amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-28 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
4-16 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
3-22 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
April 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1