+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- HB 2749 substituted for SB 1666. Motion carried.: PASSED
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- NREW - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 25, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 4, 2020: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
February 4, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor