+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
February 2, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor