+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 152 e
- Action: Signed
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to substitute HB 2745 for SB 1374. Motion carried.
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: GOV
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to GOV - Pearce
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Pearce Sub Floor Amend to GOV - Farley
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Pearce Sub Floor Am to GOV - Gallardo #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Pearce Sub Floor Am to GOV - Gallardo #2
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Ulmer #1
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Ulmer #2
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Pearce Substitute Floor amendment to the Government Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
5-12 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Government
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 28, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
April 1, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 4, 2008: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor