+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Toma - passed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:27PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
February 13, 2019: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1