+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 10, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 296
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Braswell flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Garcia flr amend (ref Huppenthal flr amend)
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Crandall
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Leff flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Braswell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Leff flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Braswell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
7-15 ed_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 25, 2010: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
February 10, 2010: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 10, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor