+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 333
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: ED - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to ED - Crandall
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to Bill - Schapira
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment; reference to the Education Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Floor amendment; reference to the Education Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
7-15 ed_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
March 23, 2010: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 22, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2010: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor