+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 295
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pm
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Deschene
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:26 pmobject
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Deschene Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Deschene Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 27, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 30, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 10, 2010: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1