+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Held
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ENV
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Environment
House Proposed Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Environment
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
February 1, 2012: Environment: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor