+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
February 9, 2010: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor