+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor