+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Jud
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HSPR
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Clark
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Clark Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights
House Adopted Amendment
Clark Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights
House Adopted Amendment
3-21 gov-jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 20, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor