+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2008: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor