+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 157
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:55 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-23 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2010: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 15, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
February 9, 2010: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2