+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Jones
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-12 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor