+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 292
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:31 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Carter Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Carter Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-28 gr_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 8, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2011: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor