+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: failed to pass.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Griffin - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Griffin moved that the HB 2716 be referred to an additional COW pursuant to House Rule 12(O).
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 26
March 18, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
February 1, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor