+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 151
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:05 pm
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass amended
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
Education (K-12)
House Adopted Amendment
3-26 k12
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2007: Education K-12: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
March 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2007: Education (K-12): Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor