+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: failed to pass.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Hoffman - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 4
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 2, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 2, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor