+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 16
- Action: Signed
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House miscellaneous motion: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Transmit to House
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Biggs, Cajero Bedford, Shooter
- Recommendation: that the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Vote detail 36 19 5 0 passed
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- House appointed: Tobin, Kavanagh, Meyer
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE:
- 0 0 0 0
- Miscellaneous motion
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Representative kavanagh motion to refuse to concur in Senate amendments, motion carried
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
- Senate second read
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-1 approp_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
March 28, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
March 19, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
March 19, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3