+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to COM - Nutt - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
March 4, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 1, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor