+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 340 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref ED)
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
03-13 ed-approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Crandall flr amend (ref ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-8 ed-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2012: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2012: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2