+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Biggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Amendment withdrawn: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to APPROP - Lesko
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Substitute Floor Amendment to the Appropriations Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Substitute Floor Amendment to the Appropriations Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
March 10, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
February 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor