+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref Bill) adopted
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 60
April 4, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 6, 2019: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 13, 2019: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8