+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2704 substituted for SB 1535. Motion carried.: Passed
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
May 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
May 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
May 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
May 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
April 27, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
April 27, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
April 27, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
April 27, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor