+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2007: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor